Kidd v. Cleveland et al

Plaintiff: Darrin Kidd, Jr
Defendant: Dollarway School District Board of Education, Greg Cleveland and Bettye Dunn-Wright
Case Number: 5:2012cv00069
Filed: February 17, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Kidd's complaint is dismissed with prejudice re 21 Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/26/13. (rhm)
October 25, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 settlement reached by the parties. The trial is cancelled and the final scheduling order is suspended. The Court will enter judgment dismissing this case with prejudice unless some party requests some other relief before November 22, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/25/13. (kpr)
July 31, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a status conference on August 27, 2013 at 3:00 p.m., in Courtroom B155 of the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/31/13. (kpr)
July 19, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion for Default Judgment. The Clerk is directed to send Kidd a copy of the defts' answer, document no. 3. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kidd v. Cleveland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollarway School District Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettye Dunn-Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Kidd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?