Herrod v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Sheldrick J Herrod
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00073
Filed: February 21, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 26 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this habeas action filed by Sheldrick J. Herrod. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/5/12. (vjt)
July 31, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER inviting Herrod to file a response to 21 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ray Hobbs, on or before 8/30/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/31/12. (vjt)
July 17, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order on the respondent and the Attorney General by regular mail; respondent will answer the petition within 21 days after service. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/17/12. (vjt)
May 18, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 13 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation and dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/18/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrod v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldrick J Herrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?