Irby v. Cantwell et al

Plaintiff: Zeavon Montreal Irby
Defendant: Daniel Cantwell and Lee Elkins
Case Number: 5:2012cv00099
Filed: March 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 29 Report and Recommendations granting 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/19/2012. (mcz)
August 13, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf may file a response opposing defts' 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment within fourteen days of this Order as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/13/12. (vjt)
April 3, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; dismissing Irby's claims aginst defendant Adams without prejudice; and dismissing Irby's claims against defendants Cantwell and Elkins in their official capacities without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/3/12. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irby v. Cantwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeavon Montreal Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Cantwell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Elkins
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?