Stephenson v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: DeAndra Stephenson
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00106
Filed: March 20, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's 37 Order entered on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this petition for habeas corpus is dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. The certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/18/2015. (rhm)
June 6, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DeAndra Stephenson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 06/06/2014. (rhm)
January 9, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/9/13. (kpr)
April 9, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the amended petition and this Order on the Respondent and Attorney General by regular mail. The Respondent will file an answer within 21 days after service, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/9/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAndra Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?