Robinson v. Davis et al

Plaintiff: Latarris Keith Robinson
Defendant: Larry May, Wendy Kelly, Corderro R Davis, Jimmy Banks, Jared Byers, Ables, Cynthia Jean Newton, Stevens, Curtis Mienzer, Hubbard, John Doe, Bowman and Rector
Case Number: 5:2012cv00109
Filed: March 23, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2013 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to defts' 163 160 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/18/13. (kpr)
August 21, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 98 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 92 motion to amend his complaint is DENIED; pltf's motions for reconsideration 86 96 and 102 are DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/21/12. (vjt)
August 14, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 90 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 88 Motion to Amend is DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/14/12. (vjt)
July 27, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 82 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 68 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/27/12. (kpr)
June 28, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 65 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 53 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/27/12. (vjt)
June 6, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 62 MOTION to Correct 58 Amended Complaint; the Clerk is directed to remove deft Davis from the docket sheet as a party in this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/6/12. (vjt)
May 21, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 7 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf's claims against Larry May are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; pltf shall submit an amended complaint re his claims against deft Jimmy Banks as directed within 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/21/12. (vjt)
May 15, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 45 Motion for Default Judgment against deft Corderro R. Davis. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/15/12. (vjt)
May 9, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/9/12. (vjt)
April 18, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Robinson's Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections and Statement of Necessity to the Partial Recommended Disposition; Objections to R&R due 5/14/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/18/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corderro R Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ables
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Jean Newton
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Mienzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbard
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latarris Keith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?