Green v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Wardell R Green
Defendant: Doe, Dexter Payne, Ray Hobbs, Larry May, James Banks and Danny Burl
Case Number: 5:2012cv00110
Filed: March 26, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 77 Memorandum & Order that was entered on this day, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/1/2013. (srw)
September 25, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 43 Partial Recommended Dispositon as this Court's own. Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/25/2012. (dmn)
August 24, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss Party. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/12. (kpr)
May 29, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's request to file an Amended Complaint; directing the Clerk to mail the complaint form to Plaintiff with this Order; directing Plaintiff, if he chooses to amend his Complaint, to complete the form, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/29/2012. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wardell R Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?