Halbrook v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: John Wayne Halbrook
Defendant: Ifediora, Wendy Kelley and Maria Lane
Case Number: 5:2012cv00114
Filed: March 29, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 52 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; granting 44 47 the Defendants' motions for summary judgment; dismissing this case with prejudice; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/7/2014. (kdr)
September 27, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 40 the partial recommended disposition and proposed findings; and dismissing plaintiff's claims against Dr. Ifediora, without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/27/2013. (kdr)
December 17, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 19 the proposed findings and recommended partial dispositions; denying 13 Plaintiff John Wayne Halbrook's motion for preliminary injunction; and dismissing with prejudice Halbrook's claims for monetary relief against the defendants in their official capacity. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/17/2012. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halbrook v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ifediora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wayne Halbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?