Bargo v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Jerome Allen Bargo
Defendant: Dina Tyler, James Banks, Wendy Kelly, Larry May and John Does
Case Number: 5:2012cv00127
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/12/2013. (kcs)
November 4, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 90 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition of Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's 82 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. The Court Certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/4/2013. (mcz)
October 31, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days a Response to 42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by James Banks, Larry May, Dina Tyler and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts as set forth in this Order. Plaintiff's fail ure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/31/2012. (kcs)
August 15, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 17 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; plaintiff may proceed with his April 2011 content-based freedom of speech claim against Defendants Tyler, May, and Banks; dismissing all other claims and Defendants without prejudice for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Defendants Tyler, May, and Banks; and, certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/15/2012. (dmn)
May 18, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 7 Partial Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/18/2012. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bargo v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dina Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Allen Bargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?