Holloway v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Kareem Holloway
Defendant: A McKinney, P Green, Vickey Westbrook, Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs, Larry May, Greg Harmon, Danny Burl, Todd Ball, Steve Outlaw, Jeremy Andrews and Moses Jackson
Case Number: 5:2012cv00128
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 85 dismissing Holloway's claims against Norris, Hobbs, May, Burl, Andrews, Kelley, Payne, Wright, Minor, Gay, and Perry are dismissed without prejudice. His no-meaningful-review, deliberate indifference, and retaliation claims are dismissed without prejudice based on no exhaustion. His due process claim is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/14. (kpr)
January 3, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that 61 Defendants' motion for summary judgment be granted and that 69 Defendants' motion for the Court to deem the facts contained in their statement of undisputed facts be denied as moot. Objections must be received within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/3/2014. (ks)
August 28, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining the 75 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment 69 MOTION to Deem Admitted. The Court appreciates the defendants' report on the additions to the record 79 . The case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Deere in light of the new evidence. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/28/13. (kpr)
August 15, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Report from Defendants due by 8/23/2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/15/2013. (fcd)
October 18, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Magistrate Judge's 48 and 51 Partial Recommended Dispositions. Plaintiff's 45 Motion for preliminary injunctive relief is denied. Holloway's claims against Norris, Hobbs, May, Burl, Andrews, Kelley, Payne, Wrig ht, Minor, Gay, and Perry are dismissed without prejudice. The due process claim against Outlaw, Green, Jackson, Ball, Wesbrook, McKinney, and Harmon; the retaliation claim against Outlaw; and the deliberate-indifference claim against Jackson remain. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/2012. (mcz)
June 29, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part the 14 Partial Report and Recommendations. Holloway's claims against Norris, Hobbs, May, Burl, and Andrews are dismissed without prejudice. Holloway's claim that Harmon failed to respond in a timely fashion to hi s disciplinary appeals is dismissed with prejudice. Holloway's discrimination claim deserves further consideration, and the Court requests Judge Deere to revisit this claim, including whether he should be allowed to amend his complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickey Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?