McCarty v. Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc et al

Plaintiff: Mike McCarty
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company and Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv00148
Filed: April 25, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Plaintiff's breach-of-contract claim is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff. It is ordered that Plaintiff Mike McCarty recover from Defendant Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company the amount of $47,059.32 on the breach-of-contract claim. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/10/2013. (dmn)
May 24, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re location of the trial. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/24/13. (kpr)
February 15, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 33 Motion to Dismiss; pltf's claims for the tort of bad faith and declaratory relief and pltf's requests for attorney's fees and punitive damages are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/15/13. (vjt)
December 3, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion for Declaratory Judgment without prejudice; and denying 25 Motion for Hearing without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/3/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarty v. Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike McCarty
Represented By: Charles A. Banks
Represented By: Robert William Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?