Aaron v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Kameon Vankeis Aaron
Defendant: Iko, Does, Wendy Kelly, Holeman, Brenda Stills and Marilyn Defir
Case Number: 5:2012cv00181
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 36 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/25/12. (kpr)
July 13, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/12. (kpr)
June 26, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting as its own 5 Partial Recommended Disposition; Aaron may proceed with his inadequate-medical-care and retaliation claims; dismissing Aaron's due process claim without prejudice; dismissing Defendant Wendy Kelly without prejudice ; directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for Defendants Holeman, Stills, Defir, and Iko; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the complaint and summons on Defendants Holeman, Stills, and Defir through the Delta Regional Unit, and se rve the complaint and summons on Dr. Iko through the Arkansas Department of Correction; and, certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Service shall be made without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Magistrate Judge Ray may order service on additional parties when Aaron's 6 Motion for Service is resolved. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/26/2012. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Defir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kameon Vankeis Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?