Jones v. Straughn et al

Plaintiff: Benjamin Muhammad Jones
Defendant: William Pierson, Steve Outlaw, Cynifa Putnam, Tiffanye Compton, Kenrick Nelson, Keith Taylor, Linda Erwing, Sandra Perez, Marvin Evans, Jr, Robert Naylnor, William Straughn, Keith Crockett, Eric Buck, Maurice Williams, Ray Hobbs and George Sloa
Case Number: 5:2012cv00189
Filed: May 30, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 67 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts have judgment against pltf on his claims of denial of access to the courts and excessive force; pltf's 69 Motion to Amend Complaint is denied; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/16/13. (vjt)
August 30, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of defendant Artie Morris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/30/13. (kpr)
August 20, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting oral request by defendant that all lawyers and staff affiliated with this case be authorized to bring certain electronic equipment into the Courthouse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/20/13. (kpr)
August 14, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 56 Order directing the presence of Angela Lucas. Angela Lucas is not an employee of the Arkansas Department Defendants and the defts are unaware of Ms. Lucas current address, and have not been able to locate an address for her through her former employer. In light of such, Defendants will not be required to ensure the presence of Angela Lucas at the Evidentiary Hearing on August 21, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/14/13. (kpr)
July 17, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit a short synopsis of witnesses' Rockmon Abdullah and Porter (Big Mike) John Doe's expected testimony, including what they saw or heard (witnessed) with respect to the June 22, 2012 incident. In addition, Plaintiff must provide a more specific name for Porter (Big Mike) John Doe. This additional information shall be filed within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/17/13. (kpr)
August 29, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 26 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/29/12. (vjt)
August 20, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, defts Straughn, Williams, Hobbs, Compton, Nelson, Taylor, Erwing, Perez, Evans, Naylnor, Putnam, Buck, Crockett, Pierson, Outlaw, and Sloa are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/20/12. (vjt)
July 31, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 7 Amended Complaint. Service is appropriate for defts Andre Morrison, Joseph Williams, and Melvin Wooten. The Clerk shall issue summons and the U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and second Amended Complaint on defts in care of the ADC Compliance Office, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/31/12. (kpr)
July 17, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a second amended complaint in accordance with the Court's directions set forth in this Order within 15 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to forward to plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/17/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Straughn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynifa Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffanye Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenrick Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Erwing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Naylnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Sloa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Muhammad Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?