Robertson v. McDaniel et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Robertson
Defendant: P McDaniel, Johnson, G Lay and Larry May
Case Number: 5:2012cv00196
Filed: June 1, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 35 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' motion for summary judgment 26 is granted; pltf's First Amendment and federal due process claims are dismissed with prejudice; his claim for loss of personal property is dismissed without prejudice; pltf's 34 motion to amend is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/21/13. (vjt)
October 12, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 21 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/12/12. (kpr)
September 25, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 18 Partial Report and Recommendations as the Court's own; denying 11 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to McDaniel; granting the motion as to May and Lay; and, dismissing Robertson's claims against May and Lay without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/25/2012. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. McDaniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?