Butler v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: James E Butler
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00200
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 20 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this habeas action is dismissed, with prejudice, and Judgment is entered in favor of respondent. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/15/2014. (jak)
July 16, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Petitioner to file a Reply, addressing the arguments raised in the Response 14 on or before 8/9/2013; denying 10 Petitioner's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 07/16/2013. (kcs) (Docket entry modified on 7/16/2013 to correct the linkage.) (thd).
September 13, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 5 Motion for Default Judgment. Respondent shall file a responsive pleadings within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/13/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?