Moore v. Hill et al

Plaintiff: Keith Moore
Defendant: James Hill, Lantz Goforth, Richard Lee and Charles Poole
Case Number: 5:2012cv00206
Filed: June 6, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Unopposed motion, 95 , granted. Moore has received $1,000.66 from Hill and $500.33 from Goforth. Those sums satisfy the punitive-damages part of the Judgment, 75 . The Court directs the Clerk to so note in all this Court's records. LOCAL RULE 58.2. The Judgment has been satisfied in full. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/18/2015. (jak)
March 3, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting Motion to clarify, 92 . Order, 91 , vacated. The Court transposed Hill's and Goforth's names in the previous Order. Unopposed motion, 90 , granted. The State of Arkansas has paid Moore $250.12 on behalf of Gof orth and $500.24 on behalf of Hill. That part of the Judgment, 75 , for compensatory damages against Goforth and against Hill has been satisfied. The Court directs the Clerk to so note in all this Court's records. That part of the Judgment, 75 , for punitive damages against Hill and against Goforth remains unpaid. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/3/2015. (jak)
February 26, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Motion. The State of Arkansas has paid Moore $250.12 on behalf of Hill and $500.24 on behalf of Goforth. That part of the Judgment, 75 , for compensatory damages against Hill and against Goforth has been satisfied. The Court directs the Clerk to so note in all this Court's records. The part of the Judgment, 75 , for punitive damages against Hill and against Goforth remains unpaid. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/26/2015. (jak)
November 14, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/14/2014. (jak)
August 25, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Keith Moore against James Hill for $1,500.00; in favor of Keith Moore against Lantz Goforth for $750.00. Post-judgment interest will accrue at 0.10% per annum from today until this Judgment is paid. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/25/2014. (jak)
August 19, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating the Court's previous Order 60 . The witnesses Robert K. Humphrey and Jeffrey D. Kronnick are no longer needed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/19/2014. (jak)
August 11, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of witnesses, Robert K. Humphrey (ADC #150527) and Jeffrey D. Kronnick (ADC #121499), at 8:15 a.m. on Tuesday, 19, August, 2014 for the jury trial in Courtroom 1-A, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/11/2014. (jak)
August 8, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of witnesses Robert K. Humphrey (ADC #150527) and Jeffrey D. Kronnick (ADC #121499) at 8:15 a.m. on 18 August 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/8/2014. (jak)
August 7, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of Plaintiff Keith Moore (ADC #133412) at 8:15 a.m. on 18 August 2014 and each day thereafter until completion of the trial. The Court further directs the Arkansas Department of Correction to send Moore's complete institutional and medical files with him and to allow Moore to bring any legal papers he wants to court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/7/2014. (jak)
July 15, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing the reference to Magistrate Judge H. David Young. 49 Motion for an Immediate Hearing is granted. 44 Motion in Limine granted in part and denied in part; 46 Motion in Limine granted in part and denied in part; and 50 Motion f or Expenses granted on the video and usual pre-trial expenses, and denied without prejudice on medical expenses. Moore should renew his motion with specifics if he wants some relief on medical-related expenses. Parties' pre-trial disclosure sheets and trial briefs due 22 July 2014. Moore should notify Defendants of other witnesses he plans to call by 22 July 2014, with a final list to Chambers by 1 August 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/15/2014. (jak)
July 10, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of Plaintiff Keith Moore (ADC #113412) at 1:00 p.m. on 14 July 2014 in preparation for the 4:00 p.m. pretrial conference in Courtroom B-155, 600 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas. The Court further directs the ADC to send Moore's complete institutional and medical files with him and to allow Moore to bring any legal papers he wants to court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/10/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hill
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lantz Goforth
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lee
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Poole
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?