Bryant v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Dale Bryant
Defendant: Doe, Roland Anderson, Summerville, Clower, Ray Hobbs, Wendy Kelley, Obi, Clyde, Simmons, Stell, Michael Person and Corizon Medical Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv00226
Filed: June 21, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Hot Spring
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 134 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge: Plaintiff's 126 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; Defendants' 129 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against Corizon, Inc., Stell, Summervill, Clowers and Awopetu are Dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff's claims against Obki-Okoye, Clyde and Simmons are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/6/2014. (mcz)
October 24, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 123 Motion for Reconsideration re 101 MOTION to Compel filed by Dale Bryant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/24/13. (kpr)
June 27, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 112 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/27/13. (kpr)
March 7, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 101 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/7/13. (kpr)
February 28, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 89 Motion to Deem Admitted. The Court will not receive any additional motions or responses on this issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/28/13. (kpr)
February 15, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 94 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf's motions for preliminary injunction 9 15 53 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/15/13. (vjt)
January 24, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 30 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Obi, Simmons, Corizon Medical Services Inc, Stell, 56 Answer to Complaint filed by Clyde, 66 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Sabainah Awopetu, 41 Answer to Complaint filed by Clower, Summerville. Defts have answered and supplied their correct names, and the Clerk is directed to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of these Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/24/13. (kpr)
November 26, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to forward to pltf another copy of a medical release form within five days of the date of this Order. Pltf is directed to sign and return the form to defts within 15 days of the date of this Order. Defts are directed to respond to the pending motions for injunctive relief within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/26/12. (kpr)
November 5, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's First Amendment retaliation claims against all defendants. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/5/12. (kpr)
October 11, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dale Bryant. Defts shall file responses to these motions within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/11/12. (kpr)
August 13, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations. Defendants Hobbs, Kelley and Person are dismissed from this action, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/13/2012. (pag)
July 20, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve the defts with a copy of the summons, original and amended complaints in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR, 71612, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/20/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?