Earls v. Pitts et al

Plaintiff: Jacob Thomas Earls
Defendant: Allen Cheeks, Glynn Pitts, Colton Shadwick, Milton Peebles and Robbie Fread
Case Number: 5:2012cv00235
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Arkansas
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 23 Order granting plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/22/13. (kpr)
April 16, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Colton Shadwick, Glynn Pitts. Plaintiff is directed to file a response and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts. Plaintiff shall also file an updated ifp application within 15 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk shall forward to plaintiff an ifp application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/16/13. (kpr)
September 7, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing Earls's claims against defts Fread, Peebles, and Cheeks, without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/7/12. (kpr)
August 15, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Pitts and Shadwick. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and summons on these defts without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/15/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earls v. Pitts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Cheeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glynn Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colton Shadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Peebles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Fread
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Thomas Earls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?