Williams v. Sloan et al

Plaintiff: Thelma Williams
Defendant: Jackson, Shelia Hill, C Davis, Wendy Kelley, R Cook, Stratton, Manch Banks, Duck, Williams, D L Sloan, Correctional Medical Services and Charlotte Green
Case Number: 5:2012cv00238
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion to Compel; denying 72 Motion for Discovery; and denying 73 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 01/23/2014. (rhm)
January 14, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing all claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/14/14. (kpr)
October 8, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 56 Declaration, 54 Brief in Support 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 53 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) filed by defendant Marchbanks. Plaintiff must file within 15 days of the entry of this Order a Response t o Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that complies with FED. R. CIV. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/8/13. (kpr)
January 31, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 39 Partial Report and Recommendations. All claims against D.L. Sloan are dismissed without prejudice for lack of service. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/31/2013. (dmn)
December 17, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 35 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/17/12. (kpr)
October 12, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 22 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Thelma Williams. The Clerk shall prepare summons for deft D.L. Sloan, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint at the address provided under seal without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/12/12. (kpr)
October 1, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 15 and dismissing defts Correctional Medical Services, Green, Cook, Stratton, Kelley, Jackson, Hill, Davis, Duck, Williams and Robertson without prejudice. All claims, except the food poisoning claim, are dismissed against Sloan and Machbanks without prejudice. If Williams wishes to proceed with the dismissed claims and against dismissed defts, he must, within 30 days of the entry of this order, pay the statutory filing fee of $350 and file a motion to amend and reassert these allegations. An ifp appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/1/12. (kpr)
July 17, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to submit either the $350 filing fee or an application to proceed ifp within 30 days from the entry of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to plaintiff an ifp application, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/17/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Sloan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelia Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manch Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D L Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?