Richardson v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Every Donelle Richardson
Defendant: Cynthia Newton, Jennifer McBride, Wendy Kelley and Connie Hubbard
Case Number: 5:2012cv00250
Filed: July 11, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 24, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/24/2013. (kcs)
August 30, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's Third Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 39 Defendants' Motion to Compel. The Plaintiff must sign, date, and return the "Authorization to Disclose Health Information" form to Defendants on or before 9/11/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/30/2013. (kcs)
November 30, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; allowing Plaintiff Every Donelle Richardson to proceed with his inadequate medical care claims against defendants Wendy Kelley, Jennifer McBride, Connie Hubbard and Cynthia Newton and ordering service on those four defendants; and dismissing, without prejudice, Richardson's due process claim against Kelley and McBride for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. It is certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/30/2012. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Every Donelle Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?