Anderson v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Justin Anderson
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00279
Filed: July 24, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2016 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the agreed protective order, 81 , the testimony of Latrece Gray and Jeff Harrelson is sealed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/9/2016. (jak)
February 29, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 98 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Mr. Lee is relieved - with the Court's thanks for his good work - as counsel for Petitioner. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/29/2016. (jak)
February 12, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes Russ Stetler, Dr. Victoria Reynolds, Dr. Dale Watson, Dr. Richard Adler, and Dr. Natalie Brown, to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock from 22 February 2016 to 26 February 2016 for an evidentiary hearing in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/12/2016. (jak)
December 21, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/21/2015. (jak)
November 18, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A five-day evidentiary hearing is scheduled in February on Anderson's allegations of mental illness, brain damage, and childhood trauma. The Court denied the remainder of Anderson's hearing request, 31 & 43 . The Court has reconsi dered Anderson's procedurally defaulted ineffectiveness claims arising from the alleged neurobiological limitations of young people. Anderson pleads that his trial lawyers' work was deficient for not adequately developing his youth-related allegations. Anderson may therefore present evidence on them at the hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/18/2015. (jak)
November 16, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting most of Kelley's motion as modified, 73 , and denying one part of it. Anderson must produce his lawyers' file materials that touch and concern in any way the issues to be litigated at the upcoming hearing. In general, the Co urt bars Kelley and the State of Arkansas from using any of the lawyer-file material in any proceeding other than this one. The Court grants Anderson's request for a protective order that will flesh out this general limitation. The parties shoul d collaborate and provide a draft to the Court by 18 December 2015. The Court authorizes Anderson to prepare a privilege log covering any withheld material, which Anderson must give, along with the produced material, to Kelley. Anderson should also f ile the log under seal. The Court rejects without prejudice Kelley's request to depose Marczuk and Gray. Anderson's production due to Kelley by 4 December 2015. Privilege log and ex parte under-seal exhibit due by the same date. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/16/2015. (jak)
September 14, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court got the year wrong in its continuance Order, 66 . The Court will start the evidentiary hearing on 22 February 2016 at 9:30 a.m. The pretrial conference will be 12 February 2016 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/14/2015. (jak)
September 1, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Kelley to submit a second copy of the exhibits for filing as well as an electronic copy because the state court records are so voluminous. Finally, Volume 2 of Respondent's Exhibit 8 is missing. Kelley must supplement. All additional materials due by 15 September 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/1/2015. (jak)
August 17, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion. The Court approves subpoenas to Anderson's listed witnesses. Each witness shall be paid by the United States Marshals Service for actual mileage and the witness fee. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/17/2015. (jak)
August 5, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to ensure the attendance of petitioner Justin Anderson (ADC #000961), Varner SuperMax Unit, at 8:30 a.m. on 5 October 2015 and each day thereafter until completion of the hearing at the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Co urthouse, Courtroom 1-A, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas. The Court further directs the ADC to send Mr. Anderson's complete institutional and medical files with him and to allow Mr. Anderson to bring any legal papers he wants to Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/5/2015. (jak)
January 15, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion. Anderson has shown good cause to depose one of his lawyers and for transportation for an MRI/DTI scan. The Court orders the Arkansas Department of Correction to transport Anderson to the University of Arkansas Medical Sciences Medical Center for MRI/DTI scans of his brain to be conducted at that hospital on 9 February 2015 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/15/2015. (jak)
October 28, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's embedded requests for Judgment as a matter of law or to stay this case while he exhausts state remedies. The Court will hold an evidentiary hearing on Anderson's allegations of mental illness, brain damage, and chi ldhood trauma. The following scheduled applies: Anderson lists his experts and provides their opinions by 3 April 2015; Hobbs lists his experts and provides their opinions by 22 May 2015; Anderson lists any rebuttal experts and provides their opinions by 19 June 2015; Prehearing disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 by 2 September 2015; and Evidentiary Hearing set for 5 October 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/28/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Deborah Anne Czuba
Represented By: Joshua R. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?