Hill v. Wright et al

Plaintiff: Steven Earl Hill, Jr
Defendant: Matthew Paul Wright, Jr and Scott A Taylor
Case Number: 5:2012cv00329
Filed: August 27, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 55 Order dismissing the case with prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and the related Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/7/13. (kpr)
July 1, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 40 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 36 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/1/13. (kpr)
February 7, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/7/2013. (srw)
October 3, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 Partial Report and Recommendations dismissing the claims for damages against Wright and Taylor in their official capacities, with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/3/12. (kpr)
September 13, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding service appropriate for all defts. The Clerk shall prepare summons for defts., and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint and summons on defts without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/13/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Earl Hill, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Paul Wright, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?