Johnson v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Robert Eugene Johnson
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00370
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 28 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this habeas action is dismissed without prejudice. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 04/07/2015. (rhm)
April 24, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 04/24/2014. (rhm)
March 5, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Petitioner's Motion to Stay and Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/05/2014. (kcs)
September 3, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part and declining to adopt in part the 14 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The 8 MOTION for Ruling filed by Robert Eugene Johnson, which the Court construes as a motion for default judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/3/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?