Davis v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Richard Alan Davis
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Benny Magness, James Banks, Curtis Meinzer, Joe Page, III, Maurice Culclager, Mark Stephens and F Washington
Case Number: 5:2012cv00371
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 70 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge; denying Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting Defendant's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. Davis's due process claims are dismissed with prejudice; his 8th Amendment claims are dismissed without prejudice; Davis's claim that Magness and Banks violated his constitutional rights by failing to properly staff the Varner Unit is dismissed without prejudice; his claims against defendants in their official capacities for money damages are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/18/2013. (mcz)
April 3, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to the 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James Banks, Joe Page, III, Benny Magness, F Washington, Ray Hobbs, Mark Stephens, Curtis Meinzer, Maurice Culclager within 14 days of this Order, along with a short statement setting forth the disputed facts that he believes must be decided at a trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/3/13. (kpr)
March 11, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 34 the partial recommended disposition; and denying 32 Mr. Davis's motion to amend his complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/11/2013. (kdr)
October 15, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING in their entirety in all respects the 5 proposed findings and recommended partial disposition ; and dismissing without prejudice Mr. Davis' claims against defendants Hazel Robinson and Larry May. Robinson and May are dismissed as party defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/15/2012. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Alan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Magness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Page, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Culclager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?