Eve v. Sykes et al

Plaintiff: Keon D Eve
Defendant: Tyler, Sykes, Bolin and Morris
Case Number: 5:2012cv00389
Filed: October 15, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 21 Memorandum & Order that was entered on this day, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Court certifies an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and the accompanying Order will not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/22/2013. (srw)
June 10, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If Plaintiff wishes to respond to 15 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, he should do so within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/10/2013. (srw)
January 30, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against defts Bolin and Tyler are dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim, and those defts are dismissed from this action. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/30/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eve v. Sykes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keon D Eve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?