Johnson v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Tony B Johnson
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00395
Filed: October 16, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 34 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/5/2017. (ljb)
July 9, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to advise the Court if an appeal is pending from the Pulaski County Circuit Court Petition for post-conviction release; and directing both sides, if no appeal is pending, to address whether the Petitioner's claims are procedurally defaulted. Responses are due no later than 5 p.m. on 8/8/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/9/2013. (srw)
February 8, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If the state court refuses to rule on Petitioner's Rule 37 petition, this Court is inclined to appoint counsel for Petitioner and proceed with an evidentiary hearing. However, before scheduling an evidentiary hearing, the Court will allow Respondent 30 days to determine if a ruling on the Rule 37 petition is forthcoming. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/8/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Eileen Woods Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?