Green v. Gober et al

Plaintiff: James Green
Defendant: Mark Gober, Susan Potts, Paul D Selby, Bettye Judkins, Parker Houser, Social Security Administration, Talia Lambert and Arkansas Department of Finance & Administration
Case Number: 5:2012cv00406
Filed: October 26, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Drew
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Green's claims against Weiss, Gober, Potts, and Judkin's are dismissed without prejudice. Green's Bivens claim against Colvin is dismissed without prejudice. Green's FTCA claims against Houser, Colvin, and the United States are dismissed with prejudice. Green's remaining claims against Houser, Selby, and Lambert are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/29/2015. (jak)
January 7, 2015 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the 9 February 2015 trial. The Amended Final Scheduling Order is suspended. The Court will reschedule the trial, if necessary, after ruling on the pending motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/7/2015. (jak)
September 10, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Green to correct his Statements of Facts re 103 and 106 pursuant to the instructions set forth in this Order. Green must file substituting responding statements of facts by 30 September 2014. Defendants' replies due by 10 October 2014. The Court denies 107 and 108 Motions and directs the Clerk to mail Green a copy of 53 with this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/10/2014. (jak)
August 7, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Houser's 87 Statement of Material Facts is deficient. He must file a substituted statement with specific record citations by 15 August 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/7/2014. (jak)
June 3, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion to Dismiss. All FTCA claims are dismissed with prejudice for want of jurisdiction. The Bivens claim against Colvin is dismissed without prejudice. 69 Motion to strike is denied as moot. 76 Motion is granted in part and denied in part. 71 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/3/2014. (jak)
April 16, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct the docket to reflect 52 as an Amended Complaint, not a Motion to Amend. The Clerk shall update the docket sheet to reflect that the United States of America is a defendant. The Clerk shall prepare summons for the United States, and the U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons, the complaint, the amended complaint, and this Order on the United States, by serving the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Arkansas, and the United States Attorney General, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. FED. R. CIV. P. 4(i)(1). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/16/2014. (jak)
April 2, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 44 Motion to Depose. Green's request to depose the Defendants is denied for now. Green should serve any interrogatories on Defendants' counsel and Defendants should respond. Unn opposed 45 Motion to Amend is granted for good cause. Amended Complaint due by 15 April 2014. Houser and Colvin's 49 Motion to Stay Discovery is denied without prejudice. A scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/2/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Gober et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D Selby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettye Judkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talia Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Finance & Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?