Stricklin v. Correctional Medical Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Joshua A Stricklin
Defendant: Rector, Bowman and Correctional Medical Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv00436
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 63 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered, and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/18/2013. (dmn)
May 8, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 28 Motion to Amend/Correct and directing the Clerk to docket the supplement to plaintiff's motion as his Amended Complaint; denying 31 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/8/13. (kpr)
April 29, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 28 31 MOTIONS to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint filed by Joshua A Stricklin. Defendants shall file a response within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/29/13. (kpr)
April 2, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 13 Order. Plaintiff is directed to provide an address for deft Rector within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/2/13. (kpr)
December 18, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 3 Partial Report and Recommendations in its entirety; therefore, deft Arkansas Department of Correction is DISMISSED from pltf's complaint pursuant to sovereign immunity. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/18/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stricklin v. Correctional Medical Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua A Stricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?