Jackson v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: James Lee Jackson
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00461
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; granting 5 respondent's motion to dismiss; denying 2 petitioner's writ of habeas corpus; dismissing this case, with prejudice; and denying a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/17/2013. (kdr)
April 5, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Respondent to file on or before 5/06/2013, a Reply to 8 Response (Non Motion) filed by James Lee Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/05/2013. (kcs)
January 29, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Petitioner to file, on or before 2/28/2013 a Response addressing the arguments for dismissal raised by Repondent in 5 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ray Hobbs; and 6 Brief in Support filed by Ray Hobbs. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/29/2013. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lee Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?