Gray v. Lay et al

Plaintiff: Rufus L Gray
Defendant: Gaylon Lay, Wendy Kelly, Marie Austin and Estella Murray/Bland
Case Number: 5:2013cv00042
Filed: February 11, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If the Court of Appeals grants IFP status, this Court will, of course, calculate and collect the fee down the line. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/29/2014. (jak)
May 5, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 66 Order, Gray's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/5/2014. (jak)
June 11, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge: Plaintiff filed a 7 response, and agreed that Austin and Kelly should be dismissed as defendants; finding no clear errors or fact or legal error, the Court adopts the proposal in full. Austin and Kelly are dismissed as defendants. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/11/2013. (mcz)
May 15, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding service is appropriate for Defendants Gaylon Lay and Estella Murray/Bland; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare Summons for these Defendants; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of 2 Plaintiff's Complaint and Summons on these Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/15/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Lay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Murray/Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus L Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?