Owens v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Lance Mitchell Owens
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2013cv00057
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 30 Motion to Dismiss. This case is closed re 23 Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/11/2014. (jak)
February 21, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 22 Order, Owens's amended petition for writ of habeas corpus is dismissed with prejudice. A certificate of appealability will not issue because Owens's claims are clearly time barred. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/21/2014. (jak)
March 8, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Petitioner, if he wishes to proceed with this action, to either pay the $5 statutory filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees on or before 4/8/2013; and directing the Clerk to send to Petitioner an Application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/8/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Mitchell Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?