Wilmoth et al v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Michael Shane Wilmoth, Darri Prunty, Tyrone Collins and John Does
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Ray Hobbs, Banks, Larry May and Curtis Meinzer
Case Number: 5:2013cv00060
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Arkansas
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 64 Order entered on this date. This case is hereby, dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/19/2014. (mmd)
May 1, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; denying 45 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/1/2014. (mmd)
March 17, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant's 47 Motion for Summary Judgment and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that complies with FED. R. CIV. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, within fifteen days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/17/2014. (jak)
January 6, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 , 37 , 38 and 39 Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/6/2014. (jak)
May 23, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 12 Partial Report and Recommendations; pltf Wilmoth is DISMISSED from this action for failure to state a claim; pltf Collins' equal protection claims that administrative segregation inmates lack the same rights and privileges as death-row inmates are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/23/13. (vjt)
February 28, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 2 Complaint. Plaintiff Collins failed to sign the signature page of the complaint. The Clerk is directed to send to Collins a copy of the Complaint signature page, which he is directed to sign and return to the Court for filing. Plain tiffs Prunty and Collins should submit within 30 days either the $350 statutory filing fee or an application to proceed ifp. The Clerk is further directed to send an application to proceed ifp to plaintiffs Prunty and Collins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/28/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmoth et al v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shane Wilmoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darri Prunty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?