Morrow v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Berry Morrow
Defendant: David Kelley, Erikka Boykin, Justin Reed, Brittany Burgees, LeJohn Carter, Justin Holsteed, Jonathan Ashcroft, L Raeford, Gaylon Lay and Larry May
Case Number: 5:2013cv00098
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 88 order entered on this day, judgment is entered in favor of the defendants. This case is dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/2/2014. (ks)
September 4, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying Plaintiff's claims regarding access to available video evidence as moot; Plaintiff will be granted 30 days to file a Response to 61 which complies with the instructions set forth in this Order; and denying, as moot, 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Inform. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/04/2014. (kcs)
August 15, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Defendant to file a Supplemental Response which provides all of the information requested in this Order within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/15/2014. (kcs)
April 24, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/24/2014. (kcs)
March 13, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 motion to dismiss without prejudice, claims against separate Defendants Holestead, Carter and Railford. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/13/2014. (mmd)
January 15, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet and Fed R. Civ. P. 5, 33, 34, 36, & 37. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/15/2014. (jak)
December 11, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 41 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, defts' 32 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/11/13. (vjt)
April 22, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf may proceed with his excessive force, failure to protect, retaliation, free exercise of religion, and corrective inaction claims against defts; pltf's property and access to the courts claims are dismissed without prejudice; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint, and this Order on defts Kelley, Boykin, Reed, Holsteed, Ashcroft, Carter, Burgees, Raeford, Lay, and May, without prepayment of fess and costs. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/22/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berry Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erikka Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Burgees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeJohn Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Holsteed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Ashcroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Raeford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?