Morrow v. Straughn et al

Plaintiff: Berry Morrow
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Maurice Williams, Marvin Evans, Steve Outlaw and William Straughn
Case Number: 5:2013cv00135
Filed: May 3, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 45 days of the entry of this Order, a Response to 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maurice Williams, William Straughn, Steve Outlaw, Ray Hobbs, Marvin Evans and a separate Statement of Dispu ted Facts that comply with the Local Rules and the instructions set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in 45 being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/09/2014. (kcs)
February 7, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Berry Morrow. The discovery deadline is extended until 3/10/2014, and the dispositive motion deadline is extended until 4/8/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/07/2014. (kcs)
January 8, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part, 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; Defendants must comply with the instructions in this Order on or before 1/21/2014; Denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; and granting 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time. The discovery deadline is extended until 2/06/2014 and the filing of dispositive motions until 3/6/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/08/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Straughn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berry Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?