Aaron v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Barry G Aaron
Defendant: Cynthia Renee Fallhouse, Benny Magness, Wendy Kelley, Sadeem Mahmaad, Ray Hobbs, Alton Babich, Bobby Glover, Sonya Pepper Davis, Jacqueline Carswell and Carlos Woods
Case Number: 5:2013cv00139
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2015 166 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 165 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 01/23/2015. (rhm)
February 12, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety. Mr. Aaron's 46 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/12/2014. (rhm)
January 21, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defendants to respond to 60 MOTION for Discovery filed by Barry G Aaron within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/21/14. (kpr)
January 6, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 59 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for the same reasons set forth in 7 Order. Granting 58 MOTION for Service. The Clerk shall issue summons for Defendant Dr. Sadeem Mahmaad, and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the summons and 13 Amended Complaint on Defendant, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/6/2014. (jak)
December 17, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 14 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in part as this Court's findings. Defendants Hobbs, Magness, Glover and Kelley are dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which may be granted. The Court declines to adopt the proposed findings and recommendation in all other respects. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/17/13. (kpr) (Docket text modified on 12/17/2013 to correct the linkage and the ruling.) (thd).
November 1, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 46 MOTION for Order filed by Barry G Aaron shall be construed as a motion for preliminary injunctive relief. Plaintiff's 47 MOTION for Discovery shall be re-docketed as a request for discovery from defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/1/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Renee Fallhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Magness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadeem Mahmaad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Pepper Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry G Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?