Wallace v. Kelley et al.

Plaintiff: Byron L Wallace
Defendant: G Lay, Moore, Warren, Estella Bland and Larry May
Case Number: 5:2013cv00155
Filed: May 21, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be and it is hereby dismissed. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 05/07/2014. (rhm)
October 8, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 44 MOTION to Compel . Plaintiff shall file a response within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/8/13. (kpr)
October 3, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 43 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, 20 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defts Lay and May is GRANTED; pltf's claims against Lay are dismissed without prejudice and the claims against deft May are dismissed with prejudice; pltf's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/3/13. (vjt)
June 18, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, Wendy Kelley, Jimmy E Mizell, Laura Lee Morgan, Lanvand White, M Austin, and Esau are dismissed as defts in this action based on pltf's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/18/13. (vjt)
June 6, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Moore, Warren, May, Lay and Bland. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons on defts May and Lay c/o ADC Compliance Office. Summons and the Amended Complaint should be served on defts Moore, Warren and Bland c/o Humphries and Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/6/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Kelley et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron L Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?