Rider v. Starr et al

Plaintiff: Lester Eugene Rider
Defendant: Starr and John Does
Case Number: 5:2013cv00202
Filed: July 1, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 95 and 100 Partial Recommended Dispositions. Mr. Rider's 93 Motion to amend his complaint is denied. Defendant Rita Starr's 96 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted, and Mr. Rider's claims against Ms. Starr are dismissed with prejudice. The Court previously dismissed without prejudice by separate Order 90 102 , Mr. Rider's claims against all other defendants named in this action. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/14/2016. (mcz)
January 12, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 88 Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing Lester Eugene Rider's claims against defendants Ryan Gordon, Lonnie Paranuk, James Thomas, Daniel Potter, Billy Stinnett, Lon Watson, Timothy Thomas, Garland Alexander, Courtney McClina-Lathan, Nada D'Avignon, Winston Middleton, Laurel Hooks, Crystal Bell, and Sheldon Childress without prejudice; and granting 76 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 01/12/2016. (rhm)
August 10, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court Order adopting 65 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in its entirety; dismissing without prejudice Mr. Rider's claims against defendants Andrea Butler, C. Lewis, and Michelle Corbin; and granting Mr. Rider's [8 9] motion for extension of time. He shall have up to and including August 28, 2015, to file his objections to Judge Deere's 88 Partial Recommended Disposition regarding the pending 76 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 08/10/2015. (rhm)
July 28, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Rider to use the discovery process set forth in Fed R. Civ. P. 33 by serving Interrogatories on the Defendants or otherwise ascertaining a valid service address for Michelle Corbin, and to file a Motion for Service by October 28, 2014. Failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in Defendant Corbin's dismissal from the lawsuit, without prejudice. Mr. Rider is also reminded not to file discovery requests or discovery responses with the court unless they are necessary to support a motion (or response to a motion), or to comply with a court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/28/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rider v. Starr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Eugene Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?