Beard v. Manpower US Inc et al

Plaintiff: Stacy Beard
Defendant: Bridgett Rhodes, Manpowergroup US Inc, Manpower US Inc and Renae Patterson
Case Number: 5:2013cv00220
Filed: July 17, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601 Violation of the Family and Medical Leave Act-1993
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Beard's claims against Rhodes are dismissed without prejudice for lack of service. Counts II and III of Beard's complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Count I of Beard's complaint is dismissed with prejudice against Manpower U.S., Inc., Manpowergroup U.S., Inc., and Patterson. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/23/2014. (jak)
July 29, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the parties' 21 Joint Motion for Protective Order with minor changes. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/29/2014. (jak)
October 3, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, as modified. Defendants' pleading responding to count one, the only remaining claim, is due by 10/18/13. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/3/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beard v. Manpower US Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgett Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpowergroup US Inc
Represented By: Micheal L. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpower US Inc
Represented By: Micheal L. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renae Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Beard
Represented By: Kathryn L. Hudson
Represented By: Gary J. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?