Barbee v. Smarjessi et al

Plaintiff: Sylvester O Barbee
Defendant: Andrea Weekly, A Smarjessi and Marie E Austin
Case Number: 5:2013cv00225
Filed: July 23, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Hot Spring
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 70 Order that was entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/24/2014. (ks)
April 24, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 04/24/2014. (rhm)
February 19, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion for Summary Judgment for reasons stated in the order denying his previous motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/19/2014. (ks)
February 7, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 45 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff's 37 motion for summaryu judgment is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/2014. (ks)
January 14, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Barbee's 37 Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 01/14/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbee v. Smarjessi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Weekly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Smarjessi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie E Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester O Barbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?