Reid v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Reid
Defendant: Wendy Kelly, Richard, Ray Hobbs and Rector
Case Number: 5:2013cv00249
Filed: August 6, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 91 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/13/2015. (jak)
November 20, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 71 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety. Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Summary Judgment and renewed requests for the appointment of an expert and preliminary injunctive relief are denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/20/2014. (jak)
August 19, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 61 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety. Accordingly, defendants' 58 motion to dismiss and for costs is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/19/2014. (ks)
April 22, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 44 Motions to Appoint Expert without prejudice and granting 46 Motion for a Ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 04/22/2014. (rhm)
January 29, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in their entirety 39 proposed findings and recommendations and granting Richard's 20 motion to dismiss. Richard is dismissed with prejudice from plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/29/2014. (ks)
December 2, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 28 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 22 Motion for Order are DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/2/13. (vjt)
November 15, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 29 Response filed by Wendy Kelly, Ray Hobbs directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the Defendant Dr. Margaret Peggy Rector, in care of ADC, 7300 Dollarway Road, Suite 101, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, and the U S Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the summons and complaint without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/15/2013. (rhm)
November 7, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 24 Summons Returned Unexecuted. The defendants are directed to provide to the Court, under seal, the last-known address of defendant Rector within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/7/13. (kpr)
October 22, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and 22 MOTION for Order filed by Andrew Reid. Defendants shall respond within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/22/13. (kpr)
October 1, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 7 Order directing the issuance of summons and service on defts inadvertently omitted deft Dr. Rector. Service is appropriate for deft Dr. Rector. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal is to serve a copy of the summons and the complaint on deft Rector in care of Humphries Odum and Eubanks, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/1/13. (kpr)
September 6, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Andrew Reid. The Clerk is directed to serve deft Dr. Richard in care of Humphries, Odum & Eubanks, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/6/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?