Willis v. Griffin et al

Plaintiff: Zachary Willis
Defendant: Tasha L Griffin, Charles Walker, Donald W Tate, Gaylon Lay, Larry May and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2013cv00290
Filed: September 6, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 45 Order entered on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/30/2015. (rhm)
December 4, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 34 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED PARTIAL DISPOSITION in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 26 Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/04/2014. (rhm)
October 6, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff within 14 days to file, if he chooses, a Response which addresses the substance of 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Corey Rayner. After that time has elapsed, the Court will rule on the pleadings as they stan d; to the extend Plaintiff seeks appointment of counsel, that request is denied; and if Plaintiff seeks preliminary injunctive relief, he must file a separate motion explaining precisely what relief he seeks and what evidence supports granting such relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/06/2014. (kcs)
February 19, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER granting 15 MOTION to Take Deposition from Zachary Willis filed by Corey Rayner. The parties must complete discovery on or before 6/13/2014 and file any dispositve motions on or before 7/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/19/2014. (kcs)
February 4, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare a summons for Mr. Rayner. The U.S. Marshall is directed to serve the summons, 6 amended complaint, and this Opinion and Order on Mr. Rayner, through the ADC Compliance Office, without p repayment of fees and costs, or security therefor. Mr. Willis's claims against defendants Ms. Griffin, Mr. Walker, Mr. Tate, Mr. Lay, Mr. May, and Mr. Hobbs are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/04/2014. (rhm)
January 17, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Zachary Willis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/17/2014. (rhm)
October 24, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that pltf shall file an amended complaint as directed within 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/24/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Griffin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasha L Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?