Roberts v. CrestPark Nursing Home

Plaintiff: Juanette Roberts
Defendant: CrestPark Nursing Home
Case Number: 5:2013cv00305
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/10/2015. (jak)
April 30, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: All Roberts's claims against Crestpark Stuttgart LLC, Stuttgart Vision Clinic, Dr. George M. Dunn Jr., Cheryl Connally, and Misty Cox are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/30/2015. (jak)
March 23, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Final Scheduling Order, 21 , is suspended and the 11 May 2015 trial is canceled. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue, if necessary, after the Court rules on the pending motions. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/23/2015. (jak)
July 2, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on the parties stipulations. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/2/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. CrestPark Nursing Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanette Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CrestPark Nursing Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?