Woodruff v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Darren Woodruff
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2013cv00317
Filed: October 3, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/10/2014. (rhm)
August 22, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 15 Order entered on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this 28 U.S.C. § 2254 petition is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/22/2014. (ks)
December 9, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Petitioner to file, on or before 1/6/2014, a Response addressing the arguments for dismissal raised by Respondent in 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Ray Hobbs. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/09/2013. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodruff v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?