Black v. Arkansas County Jail

Plaintiff: John Lee Black
Defendant: Arkansas County Jail and Robbie Fred
Case Number: 5:2013cv00321
Filed: October 11, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Arkansas
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 18 Memorandum and Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/17/2014. (jak)
November 26, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 the proposed findings and recommendations and dismissing defendant Arkansas County Jail from this action for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/26/2013. (kdr)
November 7, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for the defendant Robbie Fred. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons on deft without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/7/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Arkansas County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Fred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lee Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?