Doss-Cornelison v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Joy Danielle Doss-Cornelison
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2013cv00333
Filed: October 28, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and 8 Supplement. No certificate of appealability will issue because she has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/14/2014. (jak)
March 19, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendant Hobbs to file a response, if he wishes to do so, to the equitable tolling arguments rasied by Ms. Doss-Cornelison re 22 Objections to Report and Recommendations 15 . Defendant Hobbs has fourteen days from the date of this Order to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/19/2014. (jak)
February 20, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice. On de novo review, the Court declines to accept 15 Report and Recommendations, and refers the matter back so Judge Deere can consider the many points made in the 22 objections. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doss-Cornelison v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Danielle Doss-Cornelison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Ashley Argo Priest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?