Davis v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Richard Alan Davis
Defendant: Benny Magness, Joe Page, III, Maurice Culclager, Curtis Meinzer, Ray Hobbs, James Banks, Mark Stephens and Willie C Bankston
Case Number: 5:2013cv00351
Filed: November 15, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice Davis's amended complaint, 4 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/9/2014. (jak)
July 31, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to Amend. Unopposed recommendation 43 adopted. 36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/31/2014. (jak)
March 18, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 6 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS with some clarifications. All claims against Hobbs, Culclager, Page, Magness, Banks, and Stephens are dismissed without prejudice. For the reasons explained by Judge Volpe, Davis's due process claims against Meinzer and Bankston fail and are dismissed without prejudice. What remains is a retaliatory-treatment claim against Meinzer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/18/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Magness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Page, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Culclager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie C Bankston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Alan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?