Gardner v. Davis-Peppers et al

Plaintiff: Wallace A Gardner
Defendant: Sonya Davis-Peppers, Marvin Lamar Hughey, Alva Green and Wendy Kelly
Case Number: 5:2013cv00353
Filed: November 18, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 53 the recommended disposition; granting 43 defendants' motion for summary judgment and dismissing, with prejudice, Gardner's complaint. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/9/2015. (kdr)
February 24, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety in all respects 48 recommended partial disposition; denying 38 motion for an emergency preliminary injunction; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/24/2015. (ljb)
February 3, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days, a Response to 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sonya Davis-Peppers, Marvin Lamar Hughey and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that complies with the instructions set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/03/2015. (kcs)
September 30, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 31 proposed findings and recommended partial disposition in all respects; granting McDowell's and Kelley's motions for summary judgment 20 and 23 ; and dismissing without prejudice Gardner's claims against them. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/30/2014. (ljb)
April 14, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days, Responses to 20 and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Local Rule and the instructions in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/14/2014. (kcs)
March 25, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; and denying 12 Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/25/2014. (kdr)
November 22, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/22/2013. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Davis-Peppers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace A Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Davis-Peppers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Lamar Hughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alva Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?