Muhummad v. Evans et al

Plaintiff: Murry Willie Muhummad
Defendant: Whitty Evans, Curtis Meinzer, Maurice Culelager, Olson, Freeman, Brown, Davis, Hoges and Ship
Case Number: 5:2013cv00361
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: All Muhummad's claims against Olson, Freeman, Brown, Davis, and Ship, and his failure-to-escort claim against Evans, are dismissed without prejudice. Muhummad's claims against Meinzer, Culelager, and Hoskins, and all his remaining claims against Evans, are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/23/2015. (ks) (Docket text modified on 4/23/2015 to correct a typographical error)(jak)
September 11, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 59 Partial Recommended Disposition. Muhummad's 52 motion for preliminary injunctive relief is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/11/2014. (ks)
February 21, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 26 Partial Report and Recommendations. Muhammad's 27 objections are overruled because none of his many complaints and concerns demonstrate imminent irreparable harm. 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/21/2014. (jak)
January 23, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 11 adopting Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing Muhammad's claims against Ship, Davis and Brown, without prejudice. His claim regarding Evan's failure to escort him to his classification hearing is dismissed without prejudice 8 2 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/14. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhummad v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitty Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Culelager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murry Willie Muhummad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?