Jackson v. Clemmons

Plaintiff: Michael Jackson
Defendant: Faron Clemmons
Case Number: 5:2013cv00371
Filed: December 5, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties have informally notified the Court that they are finalizing a settlement in this case. The Final Scheduling Order, 33 , is therefore suspended. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/20/2015. (jak)
August 10, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint report, 46 , noted and appreciated. This case will begin on Wednesday, September 16. Pre-trial at 10:30 a.m. The venire will be present at 12:30 p.m. Counsel should be prepared to open and start the proof Wednesday afternoon. Clemmons&# 039;s motion in limine, 47 , appears solid. Jackson's 48 , does too, with caveats: the jury is entitled to hear something generic about him being imprisoned for committing a felony; and there may be an honesty issue. If the parties object to any of these limitations on the proof they should do so by 17 August 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/10/2015. (jak)
October 14, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 27 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Clemmons's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Jackson's claims for damages against Clemmons in his official capacity are dismissed without prejudice. Motion for summary judgment otherwise denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/14/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faron Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?