Tubbs v. Corizon Inc et al

Plaintiff: William R Tubbs
Defendant: Corizon Inc, Crystal Woods, Estella Bland, Laura Morgan, A Pevey, Annette Esaw, Warner, Rice, Roy Griffin, Wendy Kelly, Gaylon Lay and Debra Glover
Case Number: 5:2013cv00377
Filed: December 11, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2015 181 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 180 order entered separately today, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/3/2015. (ljb)
October 1, 2015 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall file an updated Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit within 21 days of the date of this order's entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/1/2015. (lej)
August 28, 2015 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 164 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; granting 154 Defendants' motion for summary judgment; dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's cell assignment claims as time-barred; dismissing, without prej udice, Plaintiff's excessive work claims against defendants Griffin, Kelley, Beard, Burl, Stewart, and Green-Davis for failure to exhaust administrative remedies; dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's excessive work claims against defendants Lay, Warner, Glover, and Woods; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/28/2015. (kdr)
June 2, 2015 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 137 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; and denying 135 plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order because he fails to provide evidence that his transfer from the Tucker Unit is imminent or certain. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/2/2015. (kdr)
July 24, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to identify the Doe defendant and file a Motion for Service that includes the full name and proper mailing address within fourteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/24/2014. (jak)
April 11, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting and approving 5 partial recommended disposition in all respects in its entirety. Tubb's claims against Corizon, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/11/2014. (mmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tubbs v. Corizon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Tubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Pevey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Esaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?