Avery v. Cashion et al

Plaintiff: Robert W Avery
Defendant: Mark Cashion, Lillie Phillips, Jessie M Davis, Ronald Ganna and Larry L Manning
Case Number: 5:2013cv00378
Filed: December 11, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part the 96 Proposed Findings and Recommendation; granting 86 Defendant Cashion's motion for summary judgment; dismissing Mr. Avery's claims against Mr. Cashion without prejudice; granting in part and denying in part [ 59] Defendants' motion for summary judgment; granting in part 59 Defendants' motion for summary judgment in that Mr. Avery's claims against Lt. Phillips are dismissed with prejudice; denying in part 59 Defendants' motion for summary judgment in that Mr. Avery's retaliation claims against Sgt. Manning remain pending; denying 70 Mr. Avery's motion for a temporary restraining order and injunctive relief; and certifying pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/14/2017. (mef)
December 5, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 53 Proposed Findings and Recommendation in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. It is therefore ordered that plaintiff Robert W. Avery's claims against defendant Jessie M. Davis are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/05/2016. (rhm)
December 4, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 17 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendant Ronald Ganna should be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/04/2014. (rhm)
April 30, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare Summons for Defendants Cashion, Phillips, Davis, and Manning and directing the U S Marshall to serve a copy of Plaintiff's 2 Complaint and Summons on defendants in care of the Arkansas Board of Correction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 04/30/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery v. Cashion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillie Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Ganna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry L Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?